115 Carver Rd Newton, MA 02461
Visit 115 Carver Rd in Newton, MA, 02461
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Market Activities
May 2016 - May 2016
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
4 beds3 baths3,701 sqft
4 beds3 baths3,701 sqft
Facts
Built in 1921Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Gable Lot size: 7,459 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 2,933 sqftHeat type: Hot Water Gross building area: 3,701 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialFireplaces: 1 Rooms: 9Frontage: 90 feet Bedrooms: 4Finished attic area: 384 sqft Stories: 2Basement area: 955 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 36 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleDeck area: 160 sqft Trim: NoneDetached garage area: 429 sqft
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Erika Houghtlin, age 47 | (617) 969-2535 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 11, 2010 to now) |
James G Houghtlin, age 51 | (617) 969-2535 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 11, 2010 to now) Education: Associate degree or higher |
Justine Cohen | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 11, 2010) |
|
Justine Wiltshire | (617) 928-6080 | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 31, 2005 to Feb 11, 2010) |
Jeffrey M Cohen | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 31, 2005 to Feb 11, 2010) |
|
CARVER ROAD REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 31, 2005) |
|
CARVER ROAD REALTY TRUST /S TR | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 22, 1999) |
|
Hiroko T Lee, age 94 | (617) 780-1282 | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 22, 1999 to Mar 31, 2005) Occupation: Sales Occupations |
William L Holladay | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 07, 1971) |
|
Jean G Holladay | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 07, 1971) |
|
Mary K Juillerat | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 01, 1961 to Jan 07, 1971) |
|
Ernest E Juillerat Jr | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 01, 1961 to Jan 07, 1971) |
|
Jay P Bartlett | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 25, 1957 to Aug 01, 1961) |
|
BARTLETT ALICE CLARKE | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 25, 1957 to Aug 01, 1961) |
|
Margaret P Oneill | Status: Previous owner (from May 25, 1956 to Oct 25, 1957) |
|
John J Oneill | Status: Previous owner (from May 25, 1956 to Oct 25, 1957) |
|
Edna F Gates | Status: Previous owner (to May 25, 1956) |
|
Gerald H Gates | Status: Previous owner (to May 25, 1956) |
|
Road Carver | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Food Preparation and Serving Related Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
|
David Ichikawa | (617) 964-4279 | |
Hiroko Ichikawa, age 66 | (617) 964-4279 | |
Sara R Sauder, age 41 | Status: Renter |
|
Erika Crane Stern, age 52 | (415) 749-0125 |
Neighbors
40 Carver Rd
E S Makrauer
E S Makrauer
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/2010 | Sold | $798,500 | Public records | |
03/31/2005 | Sold | $660,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $841,900.00 | ||
2015 | $786,800.00 | ||
2014 | $747,800.00 | ||
2013 | $747,800.00 | ||
2012 | $747,800.00 | ||
2011 | $730,800.00 | ||
2010 | $626,500.00 | ||
2009 | $639,300.00 | ||
2008 | $639,300.00 | ||
2007 | $664,700.00 | ||
2006 | $667,200.00 | ||
2005 | $635,400.00 | ||
2004 | $590,800.00 | ||
2003 | $527,500.00 | ||
2002 | $527,500.00 | ||
2001 | $451,500.00 | ||
2000 | $412,300.00 | ||
1999 | $375,200.00 | ||
1998 | $340,800.00 | ||
1997 | $312,700.00 | ||
1996 | $297,800.00 | ||
1995 | $251,600.00 | ||
1994 | $237,400.00 | ||
1993 | $237,400.00 | ||
1992 | $244,000.00 |