103 Truman Rd Newton, MA 02459-2639
Visit 103 Truman Rd in Newton, MA, 02459-2639
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Jan 14, 2016
Description: Install pv solar panels on roof (20 panels); (401) 574-6684 structural reinforcement req'd
- Contractor: Joseph M Wyldchirico
- Valuation: $2,000,000
- Fee: $400.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 81031 0025
- Permit #: 16010319
Nov 18, 2015
Description: Strip and re-roof, no structural work
- Contractor: Michael Q Leung
- Valuation: $700,000
- Fee: $140.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 81031 0025
- Permit #: 15110790
Nov 16, 2015
Description: Air sealing and insulation
- Contractor: Roger A Ovellette
- Valuation: $300,000
- Fee: $60.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 81031 0025
- Permit #: 15110592
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2 baths2,827 sqft
3 beds2 baths2,827 sqft
Facts
Built in 1953Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Concrete Lot size: 15,030 sqftRoof type: Gable Effective area: 2,222 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 2,827 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Oil Rooms: 6Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 3Frontage: 60 feet Bathrooms: 2Basement area: 1,210 sqft Stories: 1Finished basement area: 605 sqft Exterior condition: AverageEnclosed porch area: 132 sqft Exterior walls: Vinyl SidingAttached garage area: 220 sqft
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Shu H Shiu, age 59 | (617) 965-4449 | Status: Last owner (from Jul 11, 1996 to now) |
Andy Shiu, age 59 | (617) 965-4449 | |
Shuhhua H Shiu, age 59 | (617) 965-4449 | |
Teresa Shiu, age 59 | (617) 965-4449 | Status: Homeowner |
Andy Shui | (617) 965-4449 | |
HSIEH TZU CHIANG &AL | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
Wei Hsieh | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 23, 1992 to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
Tzu Hsieh | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 23, 1992 to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
HU KE MIN &AL | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 23, 1992) |
|
Bo He | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 23, 1992) |
|
Yunping Wang | Status: Renter Occupation: Production Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Neighbors
136 Truman Rd
S Celine Schinazi
S Celine Schinazi
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/11/1996 | Sold | $290,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $551,700.00 | ||
2015 | $515,600.00 | ||
2014 | $489,200.00 | ||
2013 | $489,200.00 | ||
2012 | $489,200.00 | ||
2011 | $489,000.00 | ||
2010 | $499,000.00 | ||
2009 | $509,200.00 | ||
2008 | $509,200.00 | ||
2007 | $518,900.00 | ||
2006 | $503,800.00 | ||
2005 | $479,800.00 | ||
2004 | $441,100.00 | ||
2003 | $393,800.00 | ||
2002 | $393,800.00 | ||
2001 | $327,500.00 | ||
2000 | $299,100.00 | ||
1999 | $272,200.00 | ||
1998 | $244,200.00 | ||
1997 | $230,400.00 | ||
1996 | $219,400.00 | ||
1995 | $205,500.00 | ||
1994 | $203,500.00 | ||
1993 | $203,500.00 | ||
1992 | $195,700.00 |