107 Truman Rd Newton, MA 02459-2640
Visit 107 Truman Rd in Newton, MA, 02459-2640
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Feb 2022
$900,000
Market Activities
Feb 2022 - Mar 2022
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2 baths3,356 sqft
3 beds2 baths3,356 sqft
Facts
Built in 1955Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 10,860 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 2,486 sqftHeat type: Radiant Gross building area: 3,356 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 7Frontage: 65 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 1,160 sqft Bathrooms: 2Finished basement area: 290 sqft Stories: 1Shed area: 48 sqft Exterior condition: AverageEnclosed porch area: 54 sqft Exterior walls: Vinyl SidingDeck area: 330 sqft Trim: NoneAttached garage area: 240 sqft
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Zhenglin Chen, age 59 | (617) 244-7175 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 17, 1998 to now) Occupation: Self employed Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher |
Weidong Chen, age 58 | (617) 244-7175 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 17, 1998 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher |
Elie A Gazer | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 30, 1990) |
|
Grace Gazer | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 30, 1990 to Feb 17, 1998) |
|
TRUMAN ROAD REALTY TRUST /S TRS | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 30, 1990) |
|
TRUMAN ROAD REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 17, 1978) |
|
Irving S Meyers | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 17, 1978 to Jan 30, 1990) |
|
Arnold S Goldstein | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 17, 1978 to Jan 30, 1990) |
|
Joel M Brown | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 17, 1978) |
|
Evelyn Bevins | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 13, 1966) |
|
John K Tr Joyce | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 12, 1963 to Jun 13, 1966) |
|
KING REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 12, 1963 to Jun 13, 1966) |
|
John W Bevins, age 82 | ||
Marlene Goldstein, age 76 |
Historical businesses records
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
SMALL BUSINESS GUIDANCE SERVICE, INC | Business type: Domestic Profit Corporation Inactive: 19901231 |
Neighbors
136 Truman Rd
S Celine Schinazi
S Celine Schinazi
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/17/1998 | Sold | $320,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $555,900.00 | ||
2015 | $519,500.00 | ||
2014 | $493,300.00 | ||
2013 | $493,300.00 | ||
2012 | $493,300.00 | ||
2011 | $494,200.00 | ||
2010 | $504,300.00 | ||
2009 | $514,600.00 | ||
2008 | $514,600.00 | ||
2007 | $533,500.00 | ||
2006 | $518,000.00 | ||
2005 | $493,300.00 | ||
2004 | $454,200.00 | ||
2003 | $405,500.00 | ||
2002 | $405,500.00 | ||
2001 | $345,500.00 | ||
2000 | $333,000.00 | ||
1999 | $303,000.00 | ||
1998 | $256,500.00 | ||
1997 | $242,000.00 | ||
1996 | $230,500.00 | ||
1995 | $233,100.00 | ||
1994 | $226,300.00 | ||
1993 | $226,300.00 | ||
1992 | $233,400.00 |