129 Truman Rd Newton, MA 02459-2640
Visit 129 Truman Rd in Newton, MA, 02459-2640
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Oct 28, 2010
Description: Strip and reroof on left side of hip roof
- Valuation: $195,000
- Fee: $36.27 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 81031 0030
- Permit #: 10100756
Nov 13, 2007
Description: Install 1 replacement window
- Contractor: The Home Depot At Home Services
- Valuation: $92,000
- Fee: $18.60 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 81031 0030
- Permit #: 07110322
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2 baths2,968 sqft
3 beds2 baths2,968 sqft
Facts
Built in 1955Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Concrete Lot size: 13,800 sqftRoof type: Hip Effective area: 2,027 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 2,968 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Oil Rooms: 6Frontage: 60 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 1,404 sqft Bathrooms: 2Finished basement area: 463 sqft Stories: 1Enclosed porch area: 140 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 20 sqft Exterior walls: Vinyl Siding
Features
Kitchen quality: Below Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
George D Demirev, age 74 | Status: Last owner (from Oct 01, 1999 to now) Occupation: Administrative Support Occupations, Including Clerical Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
|
Rayna G Lateva, age 69 | Status: Last owner (from Oct 01, 1999 to now) |
|
Gwendolyn H Yip | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 11, 1996 to Oct 01, 1999) |
|
Santa J Ono, age 61 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 11, 1996 to Oct 01, 1999) |
|
Lisa M Berlin | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
Lisa B Sazer | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
Morris R Sazer | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 11, 1996) |
|
Herbert Wein | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 23, 1963) |
|
Lillian Wein | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 23, 1963) |
|
Libby E Seltzer | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 23, 1963) |
|
Robert B Seltzer | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 23, 1963) |
|
Rayna G Demirev, age 69 |
Neighbors
136 Truman Rd
S Celine Schinazi
S Celine Schinazi
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $566,200.00 | ||
2015 | $529,200.00 | ||
2014 | $501,500.00 | ||
2013 | $501,500.00 | ||
2012 | $501,500.00 | ||
2011 | $502,700.00 | ||
2010 | $513,000.00 | ||
2009 | $523,500.00 | ||
2008 | $523,300.00 | ||
2007 | $565,400.00 | ||
2006 | $548,900.00 | ||
2005 | $522,800.00 | ||
2004 | $472,900.00 | ||
2003 | $422,200.00 | ||
2002 | $422,200.00 | ||
2001 | $351,600.00 | ||
2000 | $321,100.00 | ||
1999 | $292,200.00 | ||
1998 | $252,000.00 | ||
1997 | $237,700.00 | ||
1996 | $226,400.00 | ||
1995 | $240,200.00 | ||
1994 | $233,200.00 | ||
1993 | $233,200.00 | ||
1992 | $240,500.00 |