17 Cushing St Newton, MA 02461-1235
Visit 17 Cushing St in Newton, MA, 02461-1235
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Mar 2021
$1,858,750
Market Activities
Mar 2021 - Apr 2021
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
5 beds2.5 baths4,562 sqft
5 beds2.5 baths4,562 sqft
Facts
Built in 1893Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Brick/Fldstone Lot size: 8,640 sqftRoof type: Hip Effective area: 4,058 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 4,562 sqftHeat type: Hot Water Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 9Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 5Frontage: 90 feet Bathrooms: 2Basement area: 1,072 sqft Stories: 2.5Porch area: 280 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 57 sqft Exterior walls: ClapboardDetached garage area: 252 sqft
Features
Kitchen quality: GoodBath quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Laura K Hughes, age 51 | (617) 965-2674 | Status: Previous owner (from May 21, 2008 to Oct 30, 2015) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher |
Robert E Hughes Jr | Status: Previous owner (from May 21, 2008 to Oct 30, 2015) |
|
Ruth E Badler, age 73 | (617) 964-2422 | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 30, 1987 to May 21, 2008) |
Benjamin Badler, age 39 | (617) 964-2422 | |
Mirdza Salins | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 15, 1959 to Mar 30, 1987) |
|
Ludis A Salins | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 15, 1959 to Mar 30, 1987) |
|
Samuel Roberts | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1953 to Jun 15, 1959) |
|
Lucile Roberts | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1953 to Jun 15, 1959) |
|
Helen T Cairnes | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 30, 1953) |
|
Joseph F Cairnes | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 30, 1953) |
|
Gerrard Badler | (617) 964-4652 |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Gerard E Badler, age 75 | (617) 964-2422 | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 30, 1987 to May 21, 2008) Email: Organization: Campus Continuum LLC Title: Managing Director Specialties: All Other Support Services |
Campus Continuum LLC | SIC6: Business Services Nec |
|
Gambit Group | (617) 964-2834 | |
David Carlen | Email: Organization: Campus Continuum LLC Title: Founder And Director Specialties: All Other Support Services |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/21/2008 | Sold | $1,020,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,093,200.00 | ||
2015 | $1,021,700.00 | ||
2014 | $965,500.00 | ||
2013 | $965,500.00 | ||
2012 | $965,500.00 | ||
2011 | $947,800.00 | ||
2010 | $967,100.00 | ||
2009 | $880,100.00 | ||
2008 | $880,100.00 | ||
2007 | $913,000.00 | ||
2006 | $886,400.00 | ||
2005 | $844,200.00 | ||
2004 | $765,100.00 | ||
2003 | $683,100.00 | ||
2002 | $683,100.00 | ||
2001 | $606,400.00 | ||
2000 | $553,800.00 | ||
1999 | $503,900.00 | ||
1998 | $428,500.00 | ||
1997 | $393,100.00 | ||
1996 | $374,400.00 | ||
1995 | $363,100.00 | ||
1994 | $330,100.00 | ||
1993 | $328,700.00 | ||
1992 | $337,600.00 |