237 Varick Rd Newton, MA 02468-1837
Visit 237 Varick Rd in Newton, MA, 02468-1837
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Jun 2022
$1,905,000
Market Activities
Jun 2022 - Feb 2023
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2.5 baths4,388 sqft
3 beds2.5 baths4,388 sqft
Facts
Built in 1935Foundation type: Conc Block Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Gambrel Lot size: 11,973 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 3,725 sqftHeat type: Steam Gross building area: 4,388 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 8Frontage: 110 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 1,404 sqft Bathrooms: 2Finished basement area: 442 sqft Stories: 1.75Porch area: 319 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 252 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleBasement garages: 2 Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
David W Barnes | (617) 969-7706 | Status: Last owner (from Aug 27, 2003 to now) Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Stacie C Barnes, age 52 | (617) 969-7706 | Status: Last owner (from Aug 27, 2003 to now) Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Graduate or professional degree Email: |
Albert W Noyes, age 66 | (617) 558-0697 | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 01, 1999 to Aug 27, 2003) Occupation: Sales Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
Cathy S Jou, age 58 | (617) 558-0697 | |
Hsia Z Jou | (617) 558-0697 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Technicians and Related Support Occupations |
Julius Y Jou, age 66 | (617) 558-0697 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Technicians and Related Support Occupations |
A Noyes | (617) 558-0697 | |
Kathy S Jou | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 01, 1999 to Aug 27, 2003) |
|
Jeffrey M Sherman | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 21, 1994 to Oct 01, 1999) |
|
Sara L Sherman | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 21, 1994 to Oct 01, 1999) |
|
Robert E Clark | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 26, 1990 to Nov 21, 1994) |
|
Amy R Clark | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 26, 1990 to Nov 21, 1994) |
|
Louise F Smith | (405) 844-6195 | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 04, 1983 to Jan 26, 1990) |
Lawrence Smith | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 04, 1983 to Jan 26, 1990) |
|
Arthur M Morrissey | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 04, 1983) |
|
Harry H Kay | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 28, 1956) |
|
Marjorie E Sikes | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 30, 1955) |
|
Natalie K Morrissey | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 14, 1954) |
|
William A Morrissey | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 14, 1954) |
|
Scott H Foster | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 14, 1954) |
|
Margaret J Foster | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 14, 1954) |
|
Dah Jou | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Technicians and Related Support Occupations Email: |
|
Daw Jou | ||
Amy L Rees, age 61 | (610) 458-0464 | |
Sarah Jeffrey Sherman, age 60 | (617) 928-0220 |
Neighbors
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $868,200.00 | ||
2015 | $806,000.00 | ||
2014 | $760,500.00 | ||
2013 | $760,500.00 | ||
2012 | $760,500.00 | ||
2011 | $757,800.00 | ||
2010 | $773,300.00 | ||
2009 | $827,100.00 | ||
2008 | $812,000.00 | ||
2007 | $850,300.00 | ||
2006 | $825,500.00 | ||
2005 | $786,200.00 | ||
2004 | $739,100.00 | ||
2003 | $659,900.00 | ||
2002 | $659,900.00 | ||
2001 | $556,700.00 | ||
2000 | $530,200.00 | ||
1999 | $482,400.00 | ||
1998 | $436,200.00 | ||
1997 | $410,900.00 | ||
1996 | $391,300.00 | ||
1995 | $333,400.00 | ||
1994 | $308,700.00 | ||
1993 | $308,700.00 | ||
1992 | $331,900.00 |