29 Thurston Rd Newton, MA 02464-1242
Visit 29 Thurston Rd in Newton, MA, 02464-1242
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Market Activities
Dec 2023 - Jan 2024
Dec 2023 - Jan 2024
Jul 2016 - Aug 2016
29 Thurston Rd #1
Price history :
- 1147 sqft
- 1 bed
- 1 bath
This 1st floor unit of a well maintained 2-family home is located on a quiet street, close to all...
Building Permits
Feb 22, 2013
Description: Repair sheetrock due to storm damage, upgrade electrical, and re-insulate in porch, mudroom, and den and den ceiling. no structural work
- Valuation: $820,000
- Fee: $152.52 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 51015 0029
- Permit #: 13020510
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Two Family
4 beds2.5 baths4,008 sqft
4 beds2.5 baths4,008 sqft
Facts
Built in 1881Foundation type: Brick/Fldstone Property use: Two FamilyRoof type: Gable Lot size: 7,545 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 3,972 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Gross building area: 4,008 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 9Frontage: 50 feet Bedrooms: 4Finished attic area: 354 sqft Stories: 2Basement area: 1,282 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 72 sqft Exterior walls: Asbest ShingleEnclosed porch area: 45 sqft Trim: NoneDeck area: 90 sqft
Features
Bath quality: Below Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Matthew R Forbes | (617) 780-6357 | Status: Last owner (from Sep 01, 2005 to now) Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: Associate degree or higher |
Richard Forbes | (617) 795-0254 | Status: Last owner (from Sep 01, 2005 to now) |
Maria Santucci | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 01, 2005) |
|
SANTUCCI TERESA LIFE EST | Status: Previous owner (from May 07, 1992) |
|
Maria S Rosa | Status: Previous owner (from May 07, 1992) |
|
Clara Forbes | Status: Previous owner (from May 07, 1992 to Sep 01, 2005) |
|
Umberto Santucci | (617) 527-1035 | Status: Previous owner (from May 07, 1992 to Sep 01, 2005) |
Teresa Santucci, age 109 #1 | (617) 527-1035 | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 19, 1959 to May 07, 1992) Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
Pio Santucci | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 19, 1959) |
|
Verna M Hamilton | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 25, 1956 to Nov 19, 1959) |
|
Richard T Hamilton | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 25, 1956 to Nov 19, 1959) |
|
Dora E Evans | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 25, 1956) |
|
Walter R Evans | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 25, 1956) |
|
Mark R Forbes | ||
Matt Forbes, age 53 | Status: Homeowner Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
Jillian B Kelly, age 38 | (603) 770-8334 | |
Rachel Maillet, age 50 #1 | Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
James D Raymond, age 55 #2 | (617) 527-8131 | Status: Renter Occupation: Service Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Justine Raymond, age 54 #2 | Status: Renter Occupation: Service Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/01/2005 | Sold | $598,081 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $532,500.00 | ||
2015 | $497,700.00 | ||
2014 | $473,200.00 | ||
2013 | $473,200.00 | ||
2012 | $473,200.00 | ||
2011 | $502,600.00 | ||
2010 | $512,900.00 | ||
2009 | $539,900.00 | ||
2008 | $539,900.00 | ||
2007 | $579,200.00 | ||
2006 | $579,200.00 | ||
2005 | $562,300.00 | ||
2004 | $425,700.00 | ||
2003 | $373,400.00 | ||
2002 | $373,400.00 | ||
2001 | $313,500.00 | ||
2000 | $286,300.00 | ||
1999 | $260,500.00 | ||
1998 | $238,300.00 | ||
1997 | $229,100.00 | ||
1996 | $229,100.00 | ||
1995 | $198,100.00 | ||
1994 | $198,100.00 | ||
1993 | $198,100.00 | ||
1992 | $210,900.00 |