363 Walnut St Newton, MA 02460-1945
Visit 363 Walnut St in Newton, MA, 02460-1945
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
7 beds3.5 baths5,573 sqft
7 beds3.5 baths5,573 sqft
Facts
Built in 1900Foundation type: Brick/Fldstone Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 10,240 sqftRoof material: Slate Effective area: 5,573 sqftHeat type: Steam Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 13Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 7Frontage: 95 feet Bathrooms: 3Basement area: 1,874 sqft Stories: 2Porch area: 108 sqft Exterior condition: AverageEnclosed porch area: 55 sqft Exterior walls: Vinyl SidingDetached garage area: 380 sqft Trim: None
Features
Bath quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Victoria J Jaffe, age 54 | (617) 332-5958 | Status: Last owner (from Jul 01, 2015 to now) |
William H Jaffe, age 55 | (617) 332-5958 | Status: Last owner (from Jul 01, 2015 to now) |
Levi A Garraway, age 56 | (617) 332-2171 | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 20, 2005 to Jul 01, 2015) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Gisele Garraway, age 54 | (617) 332-2171 | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 20, 2005 to Jul 01, 2015) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher Email: |
Katherine L Monti, age 75 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 03, 1991 to Apr 20, 2005) Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
Daniel J Monti | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 03, 1991 to Apr 20, 2005) Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
Aurelia J Palubeckas | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 31, 1989 to Jul 03, 1991) |
|
Peter G Stewart | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 31, 1989 to Jul 03, 1991) |
|
Ethel H Russell | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 31, 1989) |
|
Leslie A Russell | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 31, 1989) |
|
Kathy Brathwaite | ||
Mary Louise Crain #A | ||
Christopher L Monti, age 44 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
K Monti, age 75 | ||
K Nuckolls | (617) 964-4073 | |
Katherine B Nuckolls, age 107 | (617) 964-4073 | |
Jane R Todd, age 81 | (207) 867-4651 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/20/2005 | Sold | $869,500 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $862,800.00 | ||
2015 | $806,400.00 | ||
2014 | $771,900.00 | ||
2013 | $801,700.00 | ||
2012 | $801,700.00 | ||
2011 | $789,800.00 | ||
2010 | $805,900.00 | ||
2009 | $822,300.00 | ||
2008 | $822,300.00 | ||
2007 | $781,000.00 | ||
2006 | $612,500.00 | ||
2005 | $583,300.00 | ||
2004 | $497,400.00 | ||
2003 | $436,300.00 | ||
2002 | $436,300.00 | ||
2001 | $376,600.00 | ||
2000 | $343,900.00 | ||
1999 | $312,900.00 | ||
1998 | $296,500.00 | ||
1997 | $275,800.00 | ||
1996 | $262,700.00 | ||
1995 | $265,100.00 | ||
1994 | $279,000.00 | ||
1993 | $279,000.00 | ||
1992 | $304,500.00 |