42 Hollis St Newton, MA 02458-2009
Visit 42 Hollis St in Newton, MA, 02458-2009
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Apr 2018
$950,000
Market Activities
Oct 2017 - Apr 2018
Oct 2017 - Apr 2018
Mar 2016 - Aug 2016
42 Hollis St #1
Price history :
- 1360 sqft
- 1 bed
- 1 bath
Location, location, location 1 bed 1 full bath apartment located within a short walk to Newton...
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Two Family
4 beds3 baths4,407 sqft
4 beds3 baths4,407 sqft
Facts
Built in 1900Exterior walls: Clapboard Property use: Two FamilyTrim: None Lot size: 4,736 sqftFoundation type: Brick/Fldstone Effective area: 3,903 sqftRoof type: Hip Gross building area: 4,407 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Building type: ResidentialHeat type: Steam Rooms: 10Fuel type: Gas Bedrooms: 4Frontage: 60 feet Bathrooms: 3Basement area: 1,101 sqft Stories: 2.5Porch area: 168 sqft Exterior condition: Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
CITY POINT ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC | Status: Last owner (from May 22, 2013 to now) |
|
Heather Adams | Status: Previous owner (to May 22, 2013) |
|
Tammy D Adams | Status: Previous owner (to May 22, 2013) |
|
John G Adams | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 31, 2001 to May 22, 2013) |
|
BROWN ARTHUR LEONARD TR | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 31, 2001) |
|
BROWN NOMINEE TRUST /S TR | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 31, 2001) |
|
Arthur L Brown Jr | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Jennifer K Lacey | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Judith A Brown | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Christopher J Lacey | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Christopher T Tr Tracey | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 18, 1983 to Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Avi Tr Hayon | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 18, 1983 to Nov 02, 1983) |
|
FORTY-TWO HOLLIS STREET REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 18, 1983 to Nov 02, 1983) |
|
Mary E Marchioni | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 18, 1983) |
|
Albert A Marchioni | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 18, 1983) |
|
Eric Alexson, age 57 | ||
Karen A Beauregard | (617) 527-5671 | Status: Renter Occupation: Building and Grounds Cleaning and Maintenance Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher Email: |
Gregory B Collins, age 59 | ||
Anthony C Dellaquila, age 101 | ||
Mary D Fitzhugh | (401) 965-2380 | |
Erik T Huff, age 52 | (617) 969-3406 | |
Mark White | (617) 969-3406 | |
Jacqueline Y Jacobson | Status: Renter |
|
Jean Ann Keagle, age 65 | (404) 965-0988 | |
Denece Kent #2 | (617) 696-5368 | |
Jay Kent #2 | (617) 244-1020 | |
Denece Ryland | (617) 244-1020 | |
John Kent, age 70 #2 | (617) 710-5546 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Administrative Support Occupations, Including Clerical Occupations Education: Associate degree or higher |
Annemarie Marie Latcham, age 83 | (781) 969-4410 | |
Heather L Oreilly | (617) 467-4084 | |
Craig J Paczkowski, age 54 | ||
Jessica L Smith #1 | ||
Jessica M Stebbings, age 47 #1 | ||
Beth M Thibodeau, age 57 | (617) 558-1126 | |
Malcolm White | (617) 775-3045 | Status: Renter Occupation: Service Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/31/2001 | Sold | $510,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $670,500.00 | ||
2015 | $626,600.00 | ||
2014 | $596,600.00 | ||
2013 | $493,400.00 | ||
2012 | $493,400.00 | ||
2011 | $507,600.00 | ||
2010 | $518,000.00 | ||
2009 | $545,300.00 | ||
2008 | $545,300.00 | ||
2007 | $578,000.00 | ||
2006 | $561,200.00 | ||
2005 | $544,900.00 | ||
2004 | $391,700.00 | ||
2003 | $343,600.00 | ||
2002 | $343,600.00 | ||
2001 | $306,700.00 | ||
2000 | $280,100.00 | ||
1999 | $254,900.00 | ||
1998 | $285,800.00 | ||
1997 | $265,900.00 | ||
1996 | $253,200.00 | ||
1995 | $213,900.00 | ||
1994 | $225,200.00 | ||
1993 | $225,200.00 | ||
1992 | $246,800.00 |