47 Roundwood Rd Newton, MA 02464-1218
Visit 47 Roundwood Rd in Newton, MA, 02464-1218
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
2 beds1.5 baths2,088 sqft
2 beds1.5 baths2,088 sqft
Facts
Built in 1940Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Conc Block Lot size: 7,880 sqftRoof type: Gable Effective area: 1,923 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 2,088 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Oil Rooms: 5Frontage: 90 feet Bedrooms: 2Basement area: 660 sqft Stories: 1.75Porch area: 108 sqft Exterior condition: AverageBasement garages: 1 Exterior walls: Wood Shingle
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Joseph L Sipos, age 43 | Status: Last owner (from May 21, 2009 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
Gail M Kramer, age 62 | (617) 244-4354 | Status: Previous owner (to May 21, 2009) |
Matthew B Kramer | Status: Previous owner (to May 21, 2009) |
|
Gail M Rosen | Status: Previous owner (to May 21, 2009) |
|
Daniel J Curhan | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 29, 1987) |
|
Helen A P Curhan | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 29, 1987) |
|
Karen I Silins | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 29, 1987) |
|
Astrida I Silins | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 29, 1987) |
|
Arthur F Coughlin | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 28, 1969) |
|
Mary J Coughlin | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 28, 1969) |
|
Norman Polner | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 13, 1957 to Nov 28, 1969) |
|
Honey Polner | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 13, 1957 to Nov 28, 1969) |
|
LAMBERT MARY ELIZABETH | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 13, 1957) |
|
Stanley Lambert | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 13, 1957) |
|
LAMPERT MARY ELIZABETH | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 23, 1951) |
|
Stanley Lampert | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 23, 1951) |
|
John Miller | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 23, 1951) |
|
Florence H Miller | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 23, 1951) |
|
B Achin | (617) 969-2627 | |
Brittany M Sipos, age 41 | Status: Renter |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/21/2009 | Sold | $385,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $456,600.00 | ||
2015 | $426,700.00 | ||
2014 | $404,900.00 | ||
2013 | $404,900.00 | ||
2012 | $404,900.00 | ||
2011 | $414,300.00 | ||
2010 | $422,800.00 | ||
2009 | $431,400.00 | ||
2008 | $431,400.00 | ||
2007 | $473,400.00 | ||
2006 | $459,600.00 | ||
2005 | $437,700.00 | ||
2004 | $363,400.00 | ||
2003 | $324,500.00 | ||
2002 | $324,500.00 | ||
2001 | $274,400.00 | ||
2000 | $250,600.00 | ||
1999 | $228,000.00 | ||
1998 | $205,600.00 | ||
1997 | $197,700.00 | ||
1996 | $197,700.00 | ||
1995 | $174,900.00 | ||
1994 | $174,900.00 | ||
1993 | $174,900.00 | ||
1992 | $202,600.00 |