57 Hatfield Rd Newton, MA 02465-1228
Visit 57 Hatfield Rd in Newton, MA, 02465-1228
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Sep 2023
$870,000
Market Activities
May 2023 - Sep 2023
May 2023 - Sep 2023
Jul 2016 - Aug 2016
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Two Family
3 beds3.5 baths3,174 sqft
3 beds3.5 baths3,174 sqft
Facts
Built in 1940Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Two FamilyRoof type: Gable Lot size: 7,104 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 2,962 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Gross building area: 3,174 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Unit/AC Rooms: 8Frontage: 77 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 898 sqft Stories: 1.75Shed area: 30 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 120 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleAttached garage area: 252 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Christina W Yee | Status: Last owner (from May 07, 2013 to now) |
|
HU TIAN HUA | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 19, 2012 to May 07, 2013) |
|
Frank W Yee | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 15, 1998 to May 07, 2013) |
|
57 HATFIELD ROAD REALTY TRUST /S TR | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 29, 1994 to Jan 15, 1998) |
|
Frank M Deangelis, age 69 | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 05, 1994 to Nov 29, 1994) Occupation: Sales Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher Email: |
|
Gaily P Yee | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 27, 1989 to May 07, 2013) |
|
Marilyn Kolkenbeck | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 18, 1954) |
|
Robert E Kolkenbeck | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 18, 1954) |
|
Lois C Derderian | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 18, 1954) |
|
Lincoln G Derderian | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 18, 1954) |
|
A Duncanson | (617) 965-1641 | |
Agustina Duncanson | (617) 965-1641 | |
Augustina Duncanson, age 51 | (617) 965-1641 | Occupation: Administration/Managerial |
Yee P Gaily | ||
Michael Hughes, age 69 | ||
Annemarie M King | (617) 969-3550 | |
Tak L Kwong | (617) 332-1947 | |
Diane Myerson, age 79 | (617) 968-3388 | Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Jay Penni, age 71 | (617) 785-3587 | Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Simon J Penni, age 36 | Status: Renter |
|
Donna Tracey | (617) 630-8258 | |
Julie Williams #2 | Status: Renter |
Historical businesses records
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
AN-LO CORPORATION | Business type: Domestic Profit Corporation Inactive: 19901231 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/1989 | Sold | $227,500 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $586,400.00 | ||
2015 | $548,000.00 | ||
2014 | $519,800.00 | ||
2013 | $519,800.00 | ||
2012 | $519,800.00 | ||
2011 | $528,400.00 | ||
2010 | $539,200.00 | ||
2009 | $567,600.00 | ||
2008 | $567,600.00 | ||
2007 | $588,900.00 | ||
2006 | $571,700.00 | ||
2005 | $555,000.00 | ||
2004 | $470,800.00 | ||
2003 | $413,000.00 | ||
2002 | $413,000.00 | ||
2001 | $351,800.00 | ||
2000 | $321,300.00 | ||
1999 | $292,400.00 | ||
1998 | $284,600.00 | ||
1997 | $268,500.00 | ||
1996 | $255,700.00 | ||
1995 | $242,500.00 | ||
1994 | $242,500.00 | ||
1993 | $242,500.00 | ||
1992 | $240,400.00 |