61 Lakeview Ave Newton, MA 02460-2300
Visit 61 Lakeview Ave in Newton, MA, 02460-2300
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Jun 2022
$4,038,723
Market Activities
Jun 2022 - Feb 2023
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2.5 baths3,470 sqft
3 beds2.5 baths3,470 sqft
Facts
Built in 1951Roof type: Hip Property use: Single FamilyRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Lot size: 18,126 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Effective area: 3,470 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 7Frontage: 110 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 1,539 sqft Exterior condition: AverageFinished basement area: 200 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleShed area: 80 sqft Trim: Full WallDeck area: 168 sqft Foundation type: ConcreteBasement garages: 2
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Arza Tr Goldstein | Status: Last owner (from Jul 19, 2006 to now) |
|
Doron Tr Schlair | Status: Last owner (from Jul 19, 2006 to now) |
|
SCHLAIR AYA LIFE EST | Status: Last owner (from Jul 19, 2006 to now) |
|
SCHLAIR FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Jul 19, 2006 to now) |
|
SCHLAIR RAMI LIFE EST | Status: Last owner (from Jul 19, 2006 to now) |
|
AYA SCHLAIR REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 02, 2006) |
|
Rami A Schlair, age 89 | (617) 965-3954 | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 06, 1998 to May 23, 2011) Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Aya Tr Schlair, age 90 | (617) 965-3954 | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 29, 1997 to May 23, 2011) Email: |
AYA SCHLAIR REALTY TRUST /S TR | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 29, 1997 to Mar 06, 1998) |
|
Martha B Binstock | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 09, 1980) |
|
Robert H Binstock | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 13, 1978 to Jul 09, 1980) |
|
Nathan Ruby | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 29, 1977 to Oct 13, 1978) |
|
Helen Ruby | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 29, 1977 to Oct 13, 1978) |
|
Robert E Glazier | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 29, 1977) |
|
Marc A Falcione | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 29, 1977) |
|
Brian Goldstein, age 63 |
Historical businesses records
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
KERAMIKA CONSULTING, INC | Business type: Domestic Profit Corporation Inactive: 20070531 |
Neighbors
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $777,900.00 | ||
2015 | $727,000.00 | ||
2014 | $682,300.00 | ||
2013 | $682,300.00 | ||
2012 | $682,300.00 | ||
2011 | $678,400.00 | ||
2010 | $692,200.00 | ||
2009 | $706,300.00 | ||
2008 | $706,300.00 | ||
2007 | $721,700.00 | ||
2006 | $700,700.00 | ||
2005 | $667,300.00 | ||
2004 | $607,200.00 | ||
2003 | $542,100.00 | ||
2002 | $542,100.00 | ||
2001 | $412,200.00 | ||
2000 | $376,400.00 | ||
1999 | $342,500.00 | ||
1998 | $311,100.00 | ||
1997 | $285,400.00 | ||
1996 | $271,800.00 | ||
1995 | $282,400.00 | ||
1994 | $282,400.00 | ||
1993 | $282,400.00 | ||
1992 | $313,700.00 |