86 Floral St Newton, MA 02461-1523
Visit 86 Floral St in Newton, MA, 02461-1523
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Market Activities
Dec 2018 - Dec 2018
86 Floral St #3
Price history :
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Two Family
3 beds2 baths3,392 sqft
3 beds2 baths3,392 sqft
Facts
Built in 1920Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Two FamilyRoof type: Gable Lot size: 5,682 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 3,392 sqftHeat type: Hot Water Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Oil Rooms: 10Frontage: 50 feet Bedrooms: 6Unfinished attic area: 380 sqft Stories: 2Basement area: 881 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 48 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleEnclosed porch area: 342 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Biling Yang #2 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 22, 2007 to now) |
|
Sebastiao R Dasilva, age 64 #2 | (617) 888-1046 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 22, 2007 to now) Education: Graduate or professional degree |
SHIFMAN MARY BETH | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 17, 2006 to Feb 22, 2007) |
|
SHIFMAN EDWARD I III | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 17, 2006 to Feb 22, 2007) |
|
SCHWARTZ REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 17, 2006) |
|
SCHWARTZ REALTY TRUST /S TRS | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 01, 2000) |
|
Phyllis S Tr Schwartz | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 13, 1987 to Nov 17, 2006) |
|
Robert T Tr Schwartz | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 13, 1987 to Nov 17, 2006) |
|
BLRJ REALTY TRUST /S TRS | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 13, 1987) |
|
John E Milott | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 14, 1969) |
|
Carole Milott | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 14, 1969) |
|
Rena G Mildner | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 20, 1959 to Aug 14, 1969) |
|
John A Mildner | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 20, 1959 to Aug 14, 1969) |
|
GILES SUSIE BEAL | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 20, 1959) |
|
Sean Beausoleil | (617) 795-0758 | |
Alicia M Belair, age 46 | ||
Jeff Capone | (617) 780-2445 | Status: Renter Occupation: Administrative Support Occupations, Including Clerical Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
Jeffrey J Capone, age 52 | ||
Jessica Capone | (617) 966-4388 | |
Kathy Castiello | Email: |
|
Daniel Louis Factor, age 62 #1 | ||
Lisa M Kaminski | ||
Richard M Kaminski, age 54 | (617) 558-3663 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree Email: |
Colby T Kervick, age 52 | ||
Patricia H Kervick, age 78 | ||
Paul A Kervick, age 46 | ||
Robyn B Kervick, age 51 | ||
Keiko Maki, age 53 #1 | ||
Lisa M Wainwright, age 52 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/22/2007 | Sold | $577,500 | Public records | |
11/17/2006 | Sold | $530,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $589,100.00 | ||
2015 | $550,600.00 | ||
2014 | $528,100.00 | ||
2013 | $528,100.00 | ||
2012 | $528,100.00 | ||
2011 | $535,200.00 | ||
2010 | $546,100.00 | ||
2009 | $574,800.00 | ||
2008 | $574,800.00 | ||
2007 | $580,800.00 | ||
2006 | $563,900.00 | ||
2005 | $547,500.00 | ||
2004 | $456,500.00 | ||
2003 | $376,500.00 | ||
2002 | $376,500.00 | ||
2001 | $330,100.00 | ||
2000 | $301,500.00 | ||
1999 | $274,300.00 | ||
1998 | $251,400.00 | ||
1997 | $230,600.00 | ||
1996 | $219,600.00 | ||
1995 | $203,800.00 | ||
1994 | $216,800.00 | ||
1993 | $216,800.00 | ||
1992 | $215,800.00 |