9 Chesley Ave Newton, MA 02460-1603
Visit 9 Chesley Ave in Newton, MA, 02460-1603
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Two Family
6 beds2 baths3,648 sqft
6 beds2 baths3,648 sqft
Facts
Built in 1906Trim: None Property use: Two FamilyFoundation type: Brick/Fldstone Lot size: 4,479 sqftRoof type: Hip Effective area: 3,352 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 3,648 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 10Frontage: 55 feet Bedrooms: 6Basement area: 876 sqft Stories: 2Shed area: 144 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 124 sqft Exterior walls: Asbest ShingleDeck area: 230 sqft
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Kenneth P Gall | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1988 to Nov 19, 2012) Occupation: Sales Occupations Education: Graduate or professional degree |
|
David A Perkins | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1988 to Oct 21, 1992) |
|
Louise A Gall | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1988 to Nov 19, 2012) |
|
Jane H Perkins | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 30, 1988 to Oct 21, 1992) |
|
Stacey C Eldredge | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 30, 1988) |
|
David S Eldredge Jr | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 30, 1988) |
|
Rober J Patriacca | Status: Last owner (from Nov 26, 1980 to now) |
|
YEN KUNG CHUN JOHN | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 26, 1980) |
|
YEN KUNG CHUN J | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 21, 1978) |
|
Jane S Yen | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 21, 1978 to Nov 26, 1980) |
|
Vincent V Altomare | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 19, 1976 to Jul 21, 1978) |
|
Carol L Altomare | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 19, 1976 to Jul 21, 1978) |
|
John Morris | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 19, 1976) |
|
David Morris | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 19, 1976) |
|
Vernor Morris | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 19, 1976) |
|
Edith V Morris | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 16, 1964 to Apr 16, 1964) |
|
Frank E Morris | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 16, 1964 to Apr 16, 1964) |
|
R Anthony | ||
Richard Anthony, age 83 | (617) 969-9196 | |
B Siebens | (617) 969-9196 | |
Rebecca Siebens, age 73 | (617) 969-9196 | |
Jessica A Dabrosca, age 47 | (617) 467-5593 | |
Brian David Giglio, age 64 | (617) 244-2377 | |
Yotam Givol | (617) 916-9868 | |
K Grearson | (617) 795-2460 | |
Katherine W Grearson, age 45 | (617) 795-2460 | |
Kevin Mckenney | (617) 795-2460 | |
Anne Lacey | ||
D Meltzer | (617) 527-8189 | |
Daniel T Meltzer, age 50 | (617) 527-8189 | |
Rebecca L Nason, age 53 | ||
Ellen M Newman | (617) 558-7295 | |
Louise A Perkins | (978) 456-8188 | |
Jonathan M Restaino, age 41 | (617) 796-7776 | |
C Velazquez | (617) 795-1966 | |
Brian R Welch #1 |
Historical businesses records
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
YOGI CHEF, INC | Industry: Eating Place Business type: Domestic Profit Corporation Inactive: 20120618 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/30/1988 | Sold | $254,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $597,900.00 | ||
2015 | $558,800.00 | ||
2014 | $530,400.00 | ||
2013 | $530,400.00 | ||
2012 | $530,400.00 | ||
2011 | $539,100.00 | ||
2010 | $550,100.00 | ||
2009 | $579,100.00 | ||
2008 | $579,100.00 | ||
2007 | $568,300.00 | ||
2006 | $551,700.00 | ||
2005 | $535,600.00 | ||
2004 | $448,500.00 | ||
2003 | $393,400.00 | ||
2002 | $393,400.00 | ||
2001 | $321,200.00 | ||
2000 | $293,300.00 | ||
1999 | $266,900.00 | ||
1998 | $270,600.00 | ||
1997 | $255,300.00 | ||
1996 | $226,400.00 | ||
1995 | $217,900.00 | ||
1994 | $217,900.00 | ||
1993 | $217,900.00 | ||
1992 | $229,800.00 |