Houses 300-360 on Commonwealth Ave, Newton MA
Commonwealth Ave, Newton MA street index
Block | Buildings | Properties | Businesses | Residents |
---|---|---|---|---|
1-299 | 7-295 | 219 | 9 | 634 |
300-360 | 300-360 | 12 | 1 | 64 |
361-417 | 361-416 | 11 | 3 | 60 |
418-466 | 418-466 | 13 | 7 | 125 |
467-499 | 467-496 | 12 | 6 | 65 |
500-525 | 504-524 | 15 | 7 | 110 |
526-538 | 526-538 | 28 | 3 | 126 |
539-550 | 539-550 | 19 | 14 | 96 |
551-565 | 551-565 | 11 | 40 | 38 |
566-599 | 566-599 | 13 | - | 88 |
600-799 | 603-799 | 82 | 90 | 619 |
Residents
300 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 6 beds
- 5 baths
- 8,496 sqft
- 1895
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Michelle S Herzlinger | Status: Last owner (from Jun 11, 2013 to now) |
|
Ronald A Herzlinger | Status: Last owner (from Jun 11, 2013 to now) |
|
J STEVEN AND VICTORIA BURRIS 1997 REVOCABLE TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 28, 2008 to Jun 11, 2013) |
305 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 5 beds
- 3 baths
- 5,862 sqft
- 1896
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
CYDNEY C JOSEPHY REVOCABLE TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Feb 16, 2006 to now) |
|
NORMAN H JOSEPHY REVOCABLE TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Feb 16, 2006 to now) |
|
Norman H Josephy | (617) 964-1071 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 13, 1979 to Feb 16, 2006) |
310 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 4 beds
- 5,885 sqft
- 1924
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Kohorn Daniel S Von | Status: Last owner (from Sep 29, 2006 to now) |
|
Margaret F Mcgovern | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 14, 1965 to Sep 29, 2006) |
|
Joseph J Mcgovern | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 15, 1956) |
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
IODICE MICHAEL F SR #2261 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 21, 1980) |
|
M J REALTY TRUST #2261 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 21, 1980) |
|
Michael F Iodice Jr #2261 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 21, 1980) |
321 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 4 beds
- 8,480 sqft
- 1922
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Martin Tan | (617) 965-0024 | Organization: Omni Real Estate Title: Real estate broker |
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Virginia Alex | Status: Last owner (from Dec 08, 1967 to now) |
|
Charlotte Manousos | Status: Last owner (from Dec 08, 1967 to now) |
|
Demetra Manousos | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 08, 1967) |
333 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 4 beds
- 2 baths
- 9,440 sqft
- 1925
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
ISKYDON LLC | Status: Last owner (from Jul 21, 2015 to now) |
|
Alan B Almeida | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 11, 1990) |
|
Georgette Iskandar | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 11, 1990 to Jul 21, 2015) |
336 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Two Family
- 5 beds
- 3 baths
- 7,485 sqft
- 1950
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Jeanne D Levy | Status: Last owner (from Sep 02, 1976 to now) |
|
Joshua P Levy | Status: Last owner (from Sep 02, 1976 to now) |
|
Helen G Glazier | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 02, 1976) |
340 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 4 beds
- 4,824 sqft
- 1927
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Karen Whiteman | Status: Last owner (from Aug 20, 2009 to now) |
|
Daniel Whiteman | Status: Last owner (from Aug 20, 2009 to now) |
|
CALECHMAN SUSAN ASHER TR | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 19, 2007 to Aug 20, 2009) |
341 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 4 beds
- 3 baths
- 5,405 sqft
- 1912
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Miriam L Reilly | Status: Last owner (from Aug 19, 1980 to now) |
|
William A Reilly Jr | Status: Last owner (from Aug 19, 1980 to now) |
|
Grace A Crowley | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 14, 1963) |
349 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 6 beds
- 12,631 sqft
- 1920
Who has lived here
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
LERNER LISA HARBURY &AL | Status: Last owner (from Apr 26, 2002 to now) |
|
Ethan A Lerner | Status: Last owner (from Apr 26, 2002 to now) |
|
Marcelle Willock | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 03, 1982 to Apr 26, 2002) |
360 Commonwealth Ave, Newton, MA
Single Family
- 6 beds
- 3 baths
- 7,222 sqft
- 1912