12 Irving St Newton, MA 02459-1611
Visit 12 Irving St in Newton, MA, 02459-1611
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Jan 2, 2009
Description: Install 5 replacement windows - no structural work
- Contractor: The Home Depot At Home Services
- Valuation: $299,700
- Fee: $55.74 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 73047 0015
- Permit #: 09010006
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds1.5 baths2,109 sqft
3 beds1.5 baths2,109 sqft
Facts
Built in 1905Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 3,210 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 2,109 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 6Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 3Frontage: 30 feet Bathrooms: 1Basement area: 602 sqft Stories: 2Shed area: 96 sqft Exterior condition: AverageEnclosed porch area: 30 sqft Exterior walls: Stucco on WoodDeck area: 41 sqft Trim: None
Features
Interior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Cathleen A Shea, age 53 | Status: Last owner (from Mar 27, 2014 to now) |
|
Alberto G Rossi, age 46 | (617) 244-2918 | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 04, 2008 to Mar 27, 2014) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Jessica A Shay | (617) 244-2918 | |
Monica Gonzalez, age 45 | Status: Previous owner (from Dec 04, 2008 to Mar 27, 2014) Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
Kira M Goddess, age 53 | (617) 969-0057 | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 04, 2008) |
Scott A Goddess, age 53 | (617) 969-0057 | Status: Previous owner (to Dec 04, 2008) |
Sheila L Goddess, age 77 | (617) 969-0057 | |
Steven J Goddess, age 78 | (617) 969-0057 | |
David J Schuller | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 18, 1977) |
|
Barbara J Fabricant | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 18, 1977) |
|
Frederic L Fabricant | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 18, 1977) |
|
Paula M Becker | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 20, 1970) |
|
R Dennis Becker | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 20, 1970) |
|
Sylvia Mack | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 26, 1966 to Mar 20, 1970) |
|
Leroy Mack | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 26, 1966 to Mar 20, 1970) |
|
Sylvia Houston | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 05, 1963 to Oct 26, 1966) |
|
Irving C 2Nd Houston | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 05, 1963 to Mar 25, 1966) |
|
Rebecca Stahl | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 05, 1963) |
|
Bertram Stahl | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 05, 1963) |
|
Buz Aaron | (617) 964-0890 | |
Janine L Altman, age 101 | (617) 332-8871 | |
Jerome L Altman, age 98 | (617) 332-8871 | |
Terry L Willins, age 69 | (781) 964-0890 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/2008 | Sold | $528,000 | Public records | |
02/23/2004 | Sold | $475,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $519,800.00 | ||
2015 | $485,800.00 | ||
2014 | $460,400.00 | ||
2013 | $460,400.00 | ||
2012 | $460,400.00 | ||
2011 | $452,400.00 | ||
2010 | $457,000.00 | ||
2009 | $466,300.00 | ||
2008 | $466,300.00 | ||
2007 | $477,100.00 | ||
2006 | $444,700.00 | ||
2005 | $423,500.00 | ||
2004 | $380,800.00 | ||
2003 | $340,000.00 | ||
2002 | $340,000.00 | ||
2001 | $273,200.00 | ||
2000 | $249,500.00 | ||
1999 | $227,000.00 | ||
1998 | $244,600.00 | ||
1997 | $206,000.00 | ||
1996 | $196,200.00 | ||
1995 | $173,500.00 | ||
1994 | $173,500.00 | ||
1993 | $173,500.00 | ||
1992 | $190,100.00 |