131 Prince St Newton, MA 02465
Visit 131 Prince St in Newton, MA, 02465
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Dec 31, 2014
Description: Installation of (14) roof mounted solar electric panels. no structural upgrade required
- Contractor: Jeffrey Constantine
- Valuation: $1,157,100
- Fee: $215.22 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32029 0008
- Permit #: 14120773
Aug 30, 2010
Description: Repair & replace exstg siding on house
- Valuation: $450,000
- Fee: $83.70 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32029 0008
- Permit #: 10080612
Jul 16, 2008
Description: Reno kitchen, update basement to include laundry room, enlarge back deck
- Contractor: Peter S Feinmann
- Valuation: $10,000,000
- Fee: $1,860.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32029 0008
- Permit #: 08070468
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
6 beds3 baths5,878 sqft
6 beds3 baths5,878 sqft
Facts
Built in 1895Foundation type: Brick/Fldstone Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Gambrel Lot size: 10,067 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 4,580 sqftHeat type: Steam Gross building area: 5,878 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 10Frontage: 75 feet Bedrooms: 6Basement area: 1,350 sqft Bathrooms: 3Finished basement area: 650 sqft Stories: 2.5Porch area: 240 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 70 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleDetached garage area: 418 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: GoodBath quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Edmund Chang, age 66 | Status: Last owner (from Jul 27, 2010 to now) Occupation: Food Preparation and Serving Related Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
|
Susan Sylligardos, age 64 | (617) 964-2488 | Status: Last owner (from Jul 27, 2010 to now) Occupation: Precision Production Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Laura M Pappano, age 62 | (617) 332-7091 | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 16, 1993 to Jul 27, 2010) |
Thomas J Lynch | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 16, 1993 to Jul 27, 2010) |
|
Raymond M Russell Jr | Status: Previous owner (from May 11, 1966) |
|
Virginia S Russell | Status: Previous owner (from May 11, 1966 to Jun 16, 1993) |
|
Eloise W Gardner | Status: Previous owner (to May 11, 1966) |
|
Frank H Gardner | Status: Previous owner (to May 11, 1966) |
|
Alexander N Chang | (617) 905-3940 | Status: Renter |
Pam Lynch, age 63 | (617) 332-6431 | |
Cindy C Rose | ||
Gini Russell, age 89 | (239) 498-5502 | |
James Sylligardos | Occupation: Production Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
|
Jeanne Sylligardos, age 94 | Occupation: Production Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/27/2010 | Sold | $1,605,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,638,800.00 | ||
2015 | $1,531,600.00 | ||
2014 | $1,452,200.00 | ||
2013 | $1,452,200.00 | ||
2012 | $1,452,200.00 | ||
2011 | $1,423,000.00 | ||
2010 | $1,267,700.00 | ||
2009 | $1,184,700.00 | ||
2008 | $1,184,700.00 | ||
2007 | $1,222,200.00 | ||
2006 | $1,186,600.00 | ||
2005 | $1,130,100.00 | ||
2004 | $1,027,300.00 | ||
2003 | $895,200.00 | ||
2002 | $895,200.00 | ||
2001 | $742,400.00 | ||
2000 | $678,000.00 | ||
1999 | $616,900.00 | ||
1998 | $528,600.00 | ||
1997 | $503,400.00 | ||
1996 | $479,400.00 | ||
1995 | $440,800.00 | ||
1994 | $440,800.00 | ||
1993 | $440,800.00 | ||
1992 | $464,800.00 |