15 White Oak Rd Newton, MA 02468-1322
Visit 15 White Oak Rd in Newton, MA, 02468-1322
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Sold Mar 2021
$1,989,000
Market Activities
Mar 2021 - Apr 2021
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
4 beds3.5 baths5,467 sqft
4 beds3.5 baths5,467 sqft
Facts
Built in 1930Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 15,088 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 5,065 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Gross building area: 5,467 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Unit/AC Rooms: 9Fireplaces: 1 Bedrooms: 4Frontage: 103 feet Bathrooms: 3Basement area: 1,746 sqft Stories: 2.5Finished basement area: 483 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 24 sqft Exterior walls: Brick VeneerDetached garage area: 420 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: GoodBath quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
15 WHITE OAK ROAD REALTY TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Jan 11, 2008 to now) |
|
SHEPARD DARYL L LIFE EST | Status: Last owner (from Jan 11, 2008 to now) |
|
SHEPARD MICHAEL C LIFE EST | Status: Last owner (from Jan 11, 2008 to now) |
|
SHEPARD MICHAEL LIFE EST | Status: Last owner (from Jan 11, 2008 to now) |
|
Daryl L Shepard, age 55 | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 11, 2003 to Jan 11, 2008) |
|
Michael C Shepard, age 55 | (617) 527-6501 | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 11, 2003 to Jan 11, 2008) |
Thomas H Grape, age 66 | (617) 965-4433 | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 15, 1997 to Feb 06, 2002) |
Anne E Grape, age 65 | (617) 965-4433 | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 15, 1997 to Apr 11, 2003) |
Anne M Egbert, age 65 | (617) 965-4433 | |
Peter L Slavin | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 30, 1991 to Aug 15, 1997) |
|
Lori G Pearlman | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 30, 1991 to Aug 15, 1997) |
|
Constance B Fuller | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 30, 1991) |
|
Henry H Fuller Jr | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 30, 1991) |
|
Constance B Logan, age 82 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 30, 1991) |
|
Angelo Traniello | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 17, 1961) |
|
Frances H Traniello | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 17, 1961) |
|
Heyward L Leavitt | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 26, 1956) |
|
Grace H Leavitt | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 26, 1956 to Mar 17, 1961) |
|
Anne M Dowd | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 26, 1956) |
|
Daryl L Fetner, age 55 | ||
Anne Grapes |
Neighbors
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,424,500.00 | ||
2015 | $1,331,300.00 | ||
2014 | $1,274,600.00 | ||
2013 | $1,274,600.00 | ||
2012 | $1,274,600.00 | ||
2011 | $1,269,300.00 | ||
2010 | $1,295,200.00 | ||
2009 | $1,321,600.00 | ||
2008 | $1,055,400.00 | ||
2007 | $1,096,700.00 | ||
2006 | $1,064,800.00 | ||
2005 | $1,014,100.00 | ||
2004 | $931,200.00 | ||
2003 | $785,400.00 | ||
2002 | $785,400.00 | ||
2001 | $650,800.00 | ||
2000 | $619,800.00 | ||
1999 | $564,000.00 | ||
1998 | $433,400.00 | ||
1997 | $410,800.00 | ||
1996 | $391,200.00 | ||
1995 | $371,100.00 | ||
1994 | $343,600.00 | ||
1993 | $343,600.00 | ||
1992 | $383,700.00 |