32 School St Newton, MA 02458-1518
Visit 32 School St in Newton, MA, 02458-1518
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2.5 baths2,638 sqft
3 beds2.5 baths2,638 sqft
Facts
Built in 1890Exterior walls: Wood Shingle Property use: Single FamilyTrim: None Lot size: 3,502 sqftFoundation type: Brick/Fldstone Effective area: 2,338 sqftRoof type: Gable Gross building area: 2,638 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Building type: ResidentialHeat type: Hot Water Rooms: 7Fuel type: Oil Bedrooms: 3Frontage: 45 feet Bathrooms: 2Basement area: 864 sqft Stories: 1.5Porch area: 90 sqft Exterior condition: AverageEnclosed porch area: 220 sqft
Features
Interior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
ROMNEOS FAMILY NOMINEE TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Feb 05, 2007 to now) |
|
Charles C Tr Romneos | Status: Last owner (from Feb 05, 2007 to now) |
|
Christos K Romneos, age 86 | (617) 969-5154 | Status: Previous owner (from May 18, 1965 to Feb 05, 2007) Occupation: Machine Operators, Assemblers, and Inspectors Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Eleni C Romneos, age 85 | (617) 969-5154 | Status: Previous owner (from May 18, 1965 to Feb 05, 2007) Education: High school graduate or higher |
Charlie C Romneos, age 51 | (617) 969-5154 | |
James C Romneos, age 54 | (617) 969-5154 | |
Joyce R Romneos, age 60 | (617) 969-5154 | |
Gregory H Adamian | Status: Previous owner (to May 18, 1965) |
|
June Adamian | Status: Previous owner (to May 18, 1965) |
|
Mary A Fay | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 25, 1955) |
|
William T Fay | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 25, 1955) |
|
REAL ESTATE MANAGERS INC | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 25, 1955) |
|
Lena C Delvecchio | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Michael Petrucci | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Gaiton Talbot | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
James Deangelo | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Jessie Dangelo | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
James Dangelo | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Estelle Talbot | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 08, 1955 to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Philomena Petrucci | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 08, 1955 to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Jessie Deangelo | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 08, 1955 to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Edward E Delvecchio | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 08, 1955 to Apr 11, 1955) |
|
Rita D Pisani | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 25, 1955 to Feb 08, 1955) |
|
Vecchio Nicholas Del | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 25, 1955) |
|
Vecchio Annie Del | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 25, 1955) |
|
Rocco J Corapi |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
C & I Realty, LLC | Industry: Real Estate Agent/Manager |
Neighbors
22 School St
J Morgenstern
J Morgenstern
12 School St
A Tserkonis
A Tserkonis
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $438,100.00 | ||
2015 | $409,400.00 | ||
2014 | $386,500.00 | ||
2013 | $386,500.00 | ||
2012 | $386,500.00 | ||
2011 | $378,900.00 | ||
2010 | $386,600.00 | ||
2009 | $394,500.00 | ||
2008 | $394,500.00 | ||
2007 | $459,300.00 | ||
2006 | $445,900.00 | ||
2005 | $424,700.00 | ||
2004 | $318,200.00 | ||
2003 | $284,100.00 | ||
2002 | $284,100.00 | ||
2001 | $238,600.00 | ||
2000 | $217,900.00 | ||
1999 | $198,300.00 | ||
1998 | $178,900.00 | ||
1997 | $178,900.00 | ||
1996 | $170,400.00 | ||
1995 | $141,600.00 | ||
1994 | $147,500.00 | ||
1993 | $147,500.00 | ||
1992 | $160,600.00 |