360 Brookline St Newton, MA 02459-3137
Visit 360 Brookline St in Newton, MA, 02459-3137
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Dec 5, 2011
Description: Strip and re-roof. no structural work
- Contractor: Lau Design Construction Inc
- Valuation: $500,000
- Fee: $93.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 82021 0020
- Permit #: 11120097
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds3.5 baths3,725 sqft
3 beds3.5 baths3,725 sqft
Facts
Built in 1952Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Gable Lot size: 10,080 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 2,947 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Gross building area: 3,725 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 9Frontage: 90 feet Bedrooms: 3Basement area: 1,556 sqft Exterior condition: AverageFinished basement area: 778 sqft Exterior walls: Wood on SheathDeck area: 56 sqft Trim: Half WallBasement garages: 2
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
HO FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Aug 06, 2014 to now) |
|
JONG ANITA HOWMAN TR | Status: Last owner (from Aug 06, 2014 to now) |
|
HO CHE TIM | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 06, 2014) |
|
HO HELEN HAK LING | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 06, 2014) |
|
Helen H Ho, age 77 | (617) 244-3388 | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 12, 1996) |
Che T Ho, age 84 | (617) 244-3388 | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 12, 1996) |
Anita H Ho, age 45 | (617) 244-3388 | |
Anatoli Vassilenko | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 01, 1993) |
|
Natalia Kidonova | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 01, 1993 to Aug 12, 1996) |
|
Robert D Stacks | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 01, 1993) |
|
Sandra E Stacks | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 31, 1971) |
|
Mary A Gately | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 08, 1967) |
|
Ruth H Hallion | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 24, 1957) |
|
Eve R Lewis | Status: Previous owner (from Mar 30, 1953 to Aug 31, 1971) |
|
Sylvia Slafsky | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 30, 1953) |
|
Eve R Barron | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 21, 1952) |
|
Stanley M Lewis | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 21, 1952 to Mar 08, 1967) |
|
HOME BUILDERS INC | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 21, 1952) |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/12/1996 | Sold | $415,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $807,000.00 | ||
2015 | $754,200.00 | ||
2014 | $717,000.00 | ||
2013 | $717,000.00 | ||
2012 | $717,000.00 | ||
2011 | $735,300.00 | ||
2010 | $755,000.00 | ||
2009 | $770,400.00 | ||
2008 | $770,400.00 | ||
2007 | $764,200.00 | ||
2006 | $741,900.00 | ||
2005 | $706,600.00 | ||
2004 | $661,500.00 | ||
2003 | $590,600.00 | ||
2002 | $590,600.00 | ||
2001 | $491,600.00 | ||
2000 | $468,200.00 | ||
1999 | $426,000.00 | ||
1998 | $391,200.00 | ||
1997 | $378,000.00 | ||
1996 | $360,000.00 | ||
1995 | $345,500.00 | ||
1994 | $274,200.00 | ||
1993 | $274,200.00 | ||
1992 | $341,300.00 |