40 Cotter Rd Newton, MA 02468-1035
Visit 40 Cotter Rd in Newton, MA, 02468-1035
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2.5 baths1,734 sqft
3 beds2.5 baths1,734 sqft
Facts
Built in 1950Exterior material: Wood Lot size: 0.29 acresStructure type: Colonial Floor size: 1,734 sqftRoof type: Asphalt Rooms: 7Heat type: Gas Bedrooms: 3Basement area: Finished basement, 998 sqft Bathrooms: 2.5Parking: Garage - Attached, 1 space Stories: 2
Features
AtticFireplace Cable ReadyLawn Double Pane/Storm WindowsWired
Listing info
Last sold: Jul 2013 for $1,145,000
Other details
Units: 1
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Edward A Cunningham #1 | Status: Last owner (from Jun 05, 2015 to now) |
|
Christopher M Douglass #1 | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 05, 2015) |
|
PENINSULA HOME BUILDERS INC #1 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 09, 2013) |
|
SPRING HOME REALTY TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from May 29, 2012 to Jul 09, 2013) |
|
Philip Tr Leung | Status: Previous owner (from May 29, 2012 to Jul 09, 2013) |
|
FRAWLEY MARYELLEN MCPHEE | Status: Previous owner (to May 29, 2012) |
|
Walter J Branson, age 64 | (617) 916-5895 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 07, 2006 to May 29, 2012) |
Albert D Branson, age 105 | (617) 916-5895 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations |
Walteer J Branson, age 64 | (617) 916-5895 | |
PHILLIPS-GRAY SUSAN A | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 07, 2006) |
|
Howard S Gray, age 74 | (617) 630-8350 | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 07, 2006) |
Howard Gary | (617) 630-8350 | |
Michael F Gray, age 56 | (617) 630-8350 | |
Gray Howard | (617) 630-8350 | |
Celeste M Krauss | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 22, 1981) |
|
PARTOVI VALLIOLAH | Status: Previous owner (to Jun 22, 1981) |
|
Marshall Z Schwartz | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 30, 1976) |
|
Michele C Schwartz | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 30, 1976) |
|
M Z SCHWARTZ &UX | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 30, 1976) |
|
Joseph G Bornstein | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 16, 1952 to Jun 30, 1976) |
|
Eva Bornstein | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 16, 1952 to Jun 30, 1976) |
|
Ersilia Dangelo | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 16, 1952) |
|
Michele Dangelo | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 16, 1952) |
|
John Branson | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations |
|
Lawrence Branson | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations |