41 Morrill St Newton, MA 02465-1345
Visit 41 Morrill St in Newton, MA, 02465-1345
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
May 5, 2016
Description: Remodel kitchen - fixtures to remain in same location - no structural work
- Contractor: Roy J Defosses
- Valuation: $2,000,000
- Fee: $400.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 34005 0003
- Permit #: 16050173
Dec 22, 2014
Description: Air sealing and insulation
- Contractor: Roger A Ovellette
- Valuation: $562,700
- Fee: $104.66 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 34005 0003
- Permit #: 14120655
Apr 17, 2008
Description: Remove and replace chimney from roofline
- Contractor: Charles K Koubek
- Valuation: $323,500
- Fee: $60.17 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 34005 0003
- Permit #: 08040402
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2 baths1,876 sqft
3 beds2 baths1,876 sqft
Facts
Built in 1953Exterior walls: Vinyl Siding Property use: Single FamilyTrim: Two Wall Lot size: 8,920 sqftFoundation type: Slab Effective area: 1,876 sqftRoof type: Gable Building type: ResidentialRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Rooms: 7Heat type: Hot Water Bedrooms: 3Fuel type: Oil Bathrooms: 2Air conditioning: None Stories: 1Frontage: 88 feet Exterior condition: AverageAttached garage area: 420 sqft
Features
Kitchen quality: Below Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Martin J Rooney, age 66 | (617) 964-0197 | Status: Last owner (from Aug 24, 1995 to now) Education: High school graduate or higher Email: |
Colleen M Rooney, age 68 | (617) 964-0197 | Status: Last owner (from Aug 24, 1995 to now) |
Renato Dagata | Status: Previous owner (from May 29, 1987 to Aug 24, 1995) |
|
Filomena Dagata | Status: Previous owner (from May 29, 1987 to Aug 24, 1995) |
|
Sue J Michaels | Status: Previous owner (to May 29, 1987) |
|
Lane S Sofman | Status: Previous owner (to May 29, 1987) |
|
Susan M Connors | (617) 529-9660 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Associate degree or higher |
Christopher G Cutler | (617) 738-6679 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/24/1995 | Sold | $262,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $494,100.00 | ||
2015 | $524,500.00 | ||
2014 | $493,300.00 | ||
2013 | $493,300.00 | ||
2012 | $493,300.00 | ||
2011 | $488,000.00 | ||
2010 | $498,000.00 | ||
2009 | $510,500.00 | ||
2008 | $510,500.00 | ||
2007 | $513,000.00 | ||
2006 | $498,100.00 | ||
2005 | $474,400.00 | ||
2004 | $434,300.00 | ||
2003 | $387,800.00 | ||
2002 | $387,800.00 | ||
2001 | $318,900.00 | ||
2000 | $291,200.00 | ||
1999 | $265,000.00 | ||
1998 | $218,900.00 | ||
1997 | $206,500.00 | ||
1996 | $196,700.00 | ||
1995 | $177,900.00 | ||
1994 | $177,900.00 | ||
1993 | $177,900.00 | ||
1992 | $191,000.00 |