59 Cook St Newton, MA 02458-1311
Visit 59 Cook St in Newton, MA, 02458-1311
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
3 beds2 baths3,571 sqft
3 beds2 baths3,571 sqft
Facts
Built in 1915Foundation type: Concrete Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 5,490 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 3,196 sqftHeat type: Hot Wtr Radiat Gross building area: 3,571 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialFrontage: 50 feet Rooms: 7Unfinished attic area: 375 sqft Bedrooms: 4Basement area: 750 sqft Stories: 2Porch area: 292 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDeck area: 261 sqft Exterior walls: Wood ShingleDetached garage area: 228 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageInterior condition: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Bryant A Borghorst, age 52 | (617) 916-5092 | Status: Last owner (from Apr 13, 2010 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: High school graduate or higher |
Valerie F Conen, age 46 | (617) 916-5092 | Status: Last owner (from Apr 13, 2010 to now) Education: High school graduate or higher |
Joseph M Haykov, age 57 | (617) 332-9386 | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 19, 2009 to Apr 13, 2010) |
Anastasia Haykov, age 79 | (617) 332-9386 | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 30, 1992 to Dec 23, 1996) |
Mark E Haykov | (617) 332-9386 | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 30, 1992 to Dec 23, 1996) |
Anastasi Haykov | (617) 332-9386 | |
HAYKOV ANASTASIA EST | Status: Previous owner (to Nov 19, 2009) |
|
Anastasia Khaykov | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 20, 1983 to Sep 30, 1992) |
|
Mark Khaykov, age 87 | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 20, 1983 to Sep 30, 1992) |
|
Samuel Fried | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 29, 1968) |
|
Irene Fried | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 29, 1968) |
|
Marion Fried | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 12, 1967) |
|
FRIED JOSEPH LOUIS | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 12, 1967 to Jul 20, 1983) |
|
Brant A Borghorst | ||
A Khaykov, age 79 | ||
Dina Rolbina |
Historical businesses records
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
MEX ASSOCIATES, INC | Business type: Domestic Profit Corporation Inactive: 19900511 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/13/2010 | Sold | $499,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $532,300.00 | ||
2015 | $490,100.00 | ||
2014 | $465,000.00 | ||
2013 | $465,000.00 | ||
2012 | $465,000.00 | ||
2011 | $460,100.00 | ||
2010 | $417,100.00 | ||
2009 | $425,600.00 | ||
2008 | $425,600.00 | ||
2007 | $505,900.00 | ||
2006 | $491,200.00 | ||
2005 | $467,800.00 | ||
2004 | $358,600.00 | ||
2003 | $320,200.00 | ||
2002 | $320,200.00 | ||
2001 | $259,300.00 | ||
2000 | $236,800.00 | ||
1999 | $215,500.00 | ||
1998 | $180,000.00 | ||
1997 | $180,000.00 | ||
1996 | $171,400.00 | ||
1995 | $164,100.00 | ||
1994 | $170,900.00 | ||
1993 | $170,900.00 | ||
1992 | $173,800.00 |