86 Waban Ave Newton, MA 02468-2131
Visit 86 Waban Ave in Newton, MA, 02468-2131
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Market Activities
Mar 2018 - May 2018
Building Permits
Oct 9, 2012
Description: Install (10) anderson replacement windows. no structural work
- Contractor: The Home Depot
- Valuation: $1,000,000
- Fee: $186.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 55039 0060
- Permit #: 12100236
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
4 beds4.5 baths5,440 sqft
4 beds4.5 baths5,440 sqft
Facts
Built in 1920Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Concrete Lot size: 10,620 sqftRoof type: Gable Effective area: 4,924 sqftRoof material: Slate Gross building area: 5,440 sqftHeat type: Hot Water Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Oil Rooms: 10Air conditioning: Unit/AC Bedrooms: 5Frontage: 95 feet Bathrooms: 4Finished attic area: 516 sqft Stories: 2Basement area: 1,352 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDetached garage area: 484 sqft Exterior walls: Brick Veneer
Features
Bath quality: Below Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Mari Shibuya, age 64 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 22, 2012 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Associate degree or higher |
|
CHUN BYONG WA | Status: Last owner (from Feb 22, 2012 to now) |
|
P-K-P TRUST | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 22, 2012) |
|
Dennis L Tr Ditelberg | Status: Previous owner (to Feb 22, 2012) |
|
FELOPULOS JOHN PETER TR | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 10, 1969) |
|
P K P TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 10, 1969) |
|
Carole M Felopulos | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 16, 1969 to Jul 10, 1969) |
|
Helen S Hyman | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 17, 1967 to Jun 16, 1969) |
|
Lester S Hyman | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 17, 1967 to Jun 16, 1969) |
|
Hugh Harwood | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 01, 1952 to Jul 17, 1967) |
|
Betty B Harwood | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 01, 1952 to Jul 17, 1967) |
|
Philip L Warren | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 01, 1952) |
|
Dora D Warren | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 01, 1952) |
|
Felice Amore, age 82 | (617) 244-4904 | |
David S Damore, age 47 | (617) 244-4904 | |
A Hemment | (617) 244-4904 | |
Andrew J Bendheim | Status: Renter |
|
Byong Chun, age 62 | Education: High school graduate or higher |
|
John P Felopulos, age 101 | (617) 332-3867 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Service Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher Email: |
Peter J Felopulos, age 63 | (617) 332-3867 | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Service Occupations Education: Bachelor's degree or higher |
Sachiko Miyahara | (412) 521-2819 | Occupation: Executive, Administrative, and Managerial Occupations |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Aglaia LLC | Industry: Security Broker/Dealer |
Neighbors
106 Waban Ave
S Stjosephs
S Stjosephs
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,013,000.00 | ||
2015 | $946,700.00 | ||
2014 | $910,700.00 | ||
2013 | $869,100.00 | ||
2012 | $824,100.00 | ||
2011 | $848,200.00 | ||
2010 | $865,500.00 | ||
2009 | $883,200.00 | ||
2008 | $883,200.00 | ||
2007 | $966,900.00 | ||
2006 | $938,700.00 | ||
2005 | $855,900.00 | ||
2004 | $796,300.00 | ||
2003 | $706,100.00 | ||
2002 | $705,700.00 | ||
2001 | $578,200.00 | ||
2000 | $550,700.00 | ||
1999 | $501,100.00 | ||
1998 | $486,100.00 | ||
1997 | $460,800.00 | ||
1996 | $438,900.00 | ||
1995 | $454,900.00 | ||
1994 | $413,500.00 | ||
1993 | $413,500.00 | ||
1992 | $489,700.00 |