92 Claremont St Newton, MA 02458-1927
Visit 92 Claremont St in Newton, MA, 02458-1927
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
4 beds2.5 baths4,204 sqft
4 beds2.5 baths4,204 sqft
Facts
Built in 1950Trim: Half Wall Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Concrete Lot size: 12,003 sqftRoof type: Gable Effective area: 3,823 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 4,204 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 9Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 4Fireplaces: 1 Bathrooms: 2Frontage: 105 feet Stories: 1.75Basement area: 1,120 sqft Exterior condition: AverageAttached garage area: 288 sqft Exterior walls: Wood Shingle
Features
Bath quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Bernice C Gully, age 86 | (617) 795-1857 | Status: Last owner (from Mar 08, 2002 to now) Occupation: Service Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher |
Richard C Gully | (617) 795-1857 | Status: Renter Email: |
BUTTON ALLYSON L EST | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 08, 2002) |
|
PHILLIPS ALLYSON BUTTON EST | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 08, 2002) |
|
PHILLIPS CHRISTOPHER ADM | Status: Previous owner (to Mar 08, 2002) |
|
Allyson L Phillips | (617) 244-0367 | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 04, 1993 to Aug 04, 1993) |
Margaret M Charlebois, age 67 | (617) 244-0367 | |
R Charlebois | (617) 244-0367 | |
Chris R Phillips, age 73 | (617) 244-0367 | Status: Homeowner |
92 CLAREMONT STREET TRUST /S TRS | Status: Previous owner (to Aug 04, 1993) |
|
92 CLAREMONT STREET TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 16, 1982) |
|
Allyson L Button | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 16, 1982 to Aug 04, 1993) |
|
Christopher R Phillips | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 16, 1982 to Aug 04, 1993) |
|
CLAREMONT STREET TRUST | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 07, 1981 to Jul 16, 1982) |
|
Peter F Tr Harrington | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 07, 1981 to Jul 16, 1982) |
|
Herbert L Connolly | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 12, 1972 to Apr 07, 1981) |
|
Mary D Connolly | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 12, 1972 to Apr 07, 1981) |
|
Christoph Phillips | Status: Homeowner Occupation: Food Preparation and Serving Related Occupations |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2002 | Sold | $720,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $763,600.00 | ||
2015 | $713,600.00 | ||
2014 | $678,400.00 | ||
2013 | $678,400.00 | ||
2012 | $678,400.00 | ||
2011 | $679,000.00 | ||
2010 | $692,900.00 | ||
2009 | $707,000.00 | ||
2008 | $707,000.00 | ||
2007 | $713,600.00 | ||
2006 | $692,800.00 | ||
2005 | $659,800.00 | ||
2004 | $603,900.00 | ||
2003 | $539,200.00 | ||
2002 | $539,200.00 | ||
2001 | $436,600.00 | ||
2000 | $398,700.00 | ||
1999 | $362,800.00 | ||
1998 | $338,400.00 | ||
1997 | $314,800.00 | ||
1996 | $299,800.00 | ||
1995 | $417,700.00 | ||
1994 | $397,800.00 | ||
1993 | $397,800.00 | ||
1992 | $400,400.00 |