15 Trowbridge Ave Newton, MA 02460-2222
Visit 15 Trowbridge Ave in Newton, MA, 02460-2222
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
4 beds3.5 baths4,923 sqft
4 beds3.5 baths4,923 sqft
Facts
Built in 1858Trim: None Property use: Single FamilyFoundation type: Brick/Fldstone Lot size: 12,596 sqftRoof type: Hip Effective area: 4,175 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Gross building area: 4,923 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Building type: ResidentialFuel type: Gas Rooms: 9Air conditioning: Central Bedrooms: 4Frontage: 120 feet Bathrooms: 3Basement area: 1,774 sqft Stories: 2Finished basement area: 640 sqft Exterior condition: AveragePorch area: 144 sqft Exterior walls: Clapboard
Features
Kitchen quality: GoodBath quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
15 TROWBRIDGE AVENUE REALTY TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Jan 14, 2014 to now) |
|
MEIER MITSUE OCHOA TR | Status: Last owner (from Jan 14, 2014 to now) |
|
Jerome F Meier, age 56 | (617) 542-6036 | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 29, 2013 to Jan 14, 2014) |
MEIER MITSUE OCHOA | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 29, 2013 to Jan 14, 2014) |
|
RANDLES J | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 29, 2013) |
|
RANDLES J C | Status: Previous owner (to Apr 29, 2013) |
|
RANDLES JOCELYN LOIS | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 02, 2004 to Apr 29, 2013) |
|
RANDLES JAMES CHRISTIAN | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 02, 2004 to Apr 29, 2013) |
|
Donald N Sull, age 61 | (617) 969-2466 | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 31, 2000 to Jul 02, 2004) Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations Education: Graduate or professional degree Email: |
Theresa M Sull, age 62 | (617) 969-2466 | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 31, 2000 to Jul 02, 2004) Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations Education: Graduate or professional degree Email: |
Melanie Carrier | (617) 969-2466 | |
Ellen C Lubell, age 65 | (617) 332-4935 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 31, 2000) |
David M Nathan, age 74 | (617) 332-4935 | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 31, 2000) |
Betsy M Nathan, age 72 | (617) 332-4935 | |
Charles B Wallace | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 29, 1964) |
|
Phyllis E Wallace | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 29, 1964) |
|
SLOCUM CHARLES PULSIFER | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 29, 1964) |
|
Winifred R Slocum | Status: Previous owner (to Sep 29, 1964) |
|
Harvey L Cohan | ||
Harvey L Cohen | (617) 965-5927 | |
Brooks H Lawrence, age 55 | (617) 630-0061 | |
David B Lubell, age 56 | ||
Mitsue O Meier, age 58 | (617) 945-0881 | Status: Renter |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
EMPORICS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC | Business type: Domestic Limited Liability Company (LLC) |
|
Randles Jrq Research | Industry: Nonclassifiable Establishments |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/29/2013 | Sold | $1,407,300 | Agent Submission | The Barbara Team |
07/02/2004 | Sold | $957,000 | Public records | |
01/31/2000 | Sold | $720,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,416,400.00 | ||
2015 | $1,323,700.00 | ||
2014 | $1,252,100.00 | ||
2013 | $1,005,400.00 | ||
2012 | $1,005,400.00 | ||
2011 | $993,500.00 | ||
2010 | $1,013,800.00 | ||
2009 | $970,700.00 | ||
2008 | $906,900.00 | ||
2007 | $945,700.00 | ||
2006 | $895,100.00 | ||
2005 | $852,500.00 | ||
2004 | $787,700.00 | ||
2003 | $703,300.00 | ||
2002 | $703,300.00 | ||
2001 | $584,200.00 | ||
2000 | $533,500.00 | ||
1999 | $485,400.00 | ||
1998 | $446,500.00 | ||
1997 | $409,600.00 | ||
1996 | $390,100.00 | ||
1995 | $399,300.00 | ||
1994 | $380,300.00 | ||
1993 | $380,300.00 | ||
1992 | $402,100.00 |