292 Otis St Newton, MA 02465-2566
Visit 292 Otis St in Newton, MA, 02465-2566
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
May 19, 2010
Description: Renovation 1st flr family, coast & powder room. 2nd flr addition for master sitting, dressing, interior finishes renovaton on exstg rooms for 3rd frl. renovate basement
- Contractor: Richard F Guidelli
- Valuation: $91,000,000
- Fee: $67,704.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32046 0004
- Permit #: 10040469
Mar 12, 2010
Description: Interior renovations - no structural
- Contractor: Richard F Guidelli
- Valuation: $2,000,000
- Fee: $372.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32046 0004
- Permit #: 10030224
Oct 26, 2009
Description: Remove & strip up to 22 ft of sill suing 8 x 8 pt
- Contractor: Thomas O Green
- Valuation: $638,500
- Fee: $118.76 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32046 0004
- Permit #: 09100593
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
5 beds4.5 baths9,843 sqft
5 beds4.5 baths9,843 sqft
Facts
Built in 1890Foundation type: Brick/Fldstone Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Mansard Lot size: 34,590 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 9,211 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Gross building area: 9,843 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialAir conditioning: Central Rooms: 14Frontage: 155 feet Bedrooms: 5Basement area: 2,787 sqft Bathrooms: 4Finished basement area: 966 sqft Stories: 2.75Porch area: 249 sqft Exterior condition: GoodDeck area: 108 sqft Exterior walls: ClapboardDetached garage area: 937 sqft Trim: None
Features
Interior condition: Excellent
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
John H Devoy, age 53 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 01, 2010 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree |
|
Julia E Devoy, age 56 | Status: Last owner (from Feb 01, 2010 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree |
|
Laurel A Oconnor, age 68 | (617) 630-8535 | Status: Previous owner (from Nov 03, 1994 to Feb 01, 2010) |
Deborah L Halloran, age 71 | (617) 630-8535 | |
John J Halloran, age 77 | (617) 630-8535 | |
Evelyn M Oconnor, age 99 | (617) 630-8535 | |
Ruth G Payne | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 06, 1992 to Nov 03, 1994) |
|
Anthony J Payne | Status: Previous owner (from Apr 06, 1992 to Nov 03, 1994) |
|
Robert W Clubb | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 24, 1964 to Apr 06, 1992) |
|
Geraldine G Clubb | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 24, 1964 to Apr 06, 1992) |
|
Douglas H Grainger | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 24, 1964) |
|
Rachel P Grainger | Status: Previous owner (to Jan 24, 1964) |
|
Bob Clubb | ||
Laurel A Connor, age 39 | Status: Renter |
|
Daniel F Erler, age 60 |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2010 | Sold | $3,300,000 | Public records | |
11/03/1994 | Sold | $880,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $4,500,000.00 | ||
2015 | $4,205,600.00 | ||
2014 | $3,960,600.00 | ||
2013 | $3,960,600.00 | ||
2012 | $3,625,000.00 | ||
2011 | $2,777,100.00 | ||
2010 | $2,040,000.00 | ||
2009 | $2,081,600.00 | ||
2008 | $2,081,600.00 | ||
2007 | $2,119,000.00 | ||
2006 | $2,057,300.00 | ||
2005 | $1,959,300.00 | ||
2004 | $1,769,600.00 | ||
2003 | $1,374,700.00 | ||
2002 | $1,372,800.00 | ||
2001 | $1,107,900.00 | ||
2000 | $1,011,800.00 | ||
1999 | $920,700.00 | ||
1998 | $805,700.00 | ||
1997 | $767,300.00 | ||
1996 | $730,800.00 | ||
1995 | $587,100.00 | ||
1994 | $559,100.00 | ||
1993 | $559,100.00 | ||
1992 | $708,600.00 |