301 Otis St Newton, MA 02465-2566
Visit 301 Otis St in Newton, MA, 02465-2566
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
Building Permits
Jun 15, 2016
Description: Interior renovations, replace 10 windows and 1 door
- Contractor: Robert E Russo Jr
- Valuation: $35,000,000
- Fee: $7,000.00 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32002 0005
- Permit #: 16060555
May 4, 2011
Description: Temp tent: 30'x40' tent from 5/11 to 5/15/11
- Valuation: $200,000
- Fee: $37.20 paid to City of Newton, Massachusetts
- Parcel #: 32002 0005
- Permit #: 11050098
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
6 beds4.5 baths10,547 sqft
6 beds4.5 baths10,547 sqft
Facts
Built in 1870Foundation type: Brick/Fldstone Property use: Single FamilyRoof type: Hip Lot size: 37,112 sqftRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Effective area: 10,443 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Gross building area: 10,547 sqftFuel type: Gas Building type: ResidentialUnfinished attic area: 659 sqft Rooms: 12Basement area: 2,822 sqft Bedrooms: 6Shed area: 60 sqft Bathrooms: 4Porch area: 726 sqft Stories: 2Enclosed porch area: 240 sqft Exterior condition: AverageDetached garage area: 900 sqft Exterior walls: ClapboardCarport area: 130 sqft Trim: None
Features
Kitchen quality: Above AverageBath quality: Good
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Karen S Conway, age 64 | (617) 641-9498 | Status: Last owner (from Jun 06, 1991 to now) Occupation: Professional/Technical Education: Graduate or professional degree |
Brian J Conway, age 65 | (617) 827-0315 | Status: Previous owner (from Jun 06, 1991 to May 02, 1994) Occupation: Administration/Managerial Education: Associate degree or higher |
CHARLES D TRAIN JR CORPORATION | Status: Previous owner (from Feb 03, 1988) |
|
Georgia Murray | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 29, 1982 to Jun 06, 1991) |
|
Mark Maloney | Status: Previous owner (from Jul 29, 1982 to Jun 06, 1991) |
|
BOSTON SAFE DEPOSIT AND TRUST CO | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 29, 1982) |
|
WARREN ALICE S EST | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 29, 1982) |
|
James T Mountz | Status: Previous owner (to Jul 29, 1982) |
|
David Robert Chase | ||
Karyn Estes | (617) 243-0372 | |
Joshua A Klevens, age 50 | (617) 571-2029 | Email: |
Anna D Sinaiko, age 48 | (617) 467-5659 | Status: Renter |
Karen S Swett |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Conwaybrian | Industry: Business Services at Non-Commercial Site |
Neighbors
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1991 | Sold | $825,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $2,531,200.00 | ||
2015 | $2,365,600.00 | ||
2014 | $2,239,100.00 | ||
2013 | $2,239,100.00 | ||
2012 | $2,239,100.00 | ||
2011 | $2,180,800.00 | ||
2010 | $2,225,300.00 | ||
2009 | $2,270,700.00 | ||
2008 | $2,270,700.00 | ||
2007 | $2,297,600.00 | ||
2006 | $2,230,700.00 | ||
2005 | $2,124,500.00 | ||
2004 | $1,936,400.00 | ||
2003 | $1,728,900.00 | ||
2002 | $1,728,900.00 | ||
2001 | $1,652,700.00 | ||
2000 | $1,111,400.00 | ||
1999 | $1,011,300.00 | ||
1998 | $925,600.00 | ||
1997 | $881,500.00 | ||
1996 | $839,500.00 | ||
1995 | $836,100.00 | ||
1994 | $796,300.00 | ||
1993 | $796,300.00 | ||
1992 | $837,900.00 |
Fire Incidents History
23 Jan 2011
Chimney or flue fire, confined to chimney or flue
Property Use: 1 or 2 family dwelling
Actions Taken: Extinguish
Area of Origin: Storage area, other
First Ignition: Chips, including wood chips
Heat Source: Hot ember or ash
Property Loss: $1,000
Actions Taken: Extinguish
Area of Origin: Storage area, other
First Ignition: Chips, including wood chips
Heat Source: Hot ember or ash
Property Loss: $1,000