342 Otis St Newton, MA 02465-2533
Visit 342 Otis St in Newton, MA, 02465-2533
This profile includes property assessor report information, real estate records and a complete residency history.
We have include the current owner’s name and phone number to help you find the right person and learn more.
PROPERTY OVERVIEW
Type: Single Family
5 beds2 baths4,915 sqft
5 beds2 baths4,915 sqft
Facts
Built in 1880Roof type: Hip Property use: Single FamilyRoof material: Asphalt Shingl Lot size: 13,272 sqftHeat type: Forced Air-Duc Effective area: 4,915 sqftFuel type: Oil Building type: ResidentialFireplaces: 3 Rooms: 10Frontage: 90 feet Bedrooms: 5Finished attic area: 420 sqft Stories: 2Unfinished attic area: 210 sqft Exterior condition: AverageBasement area: 1,255 sqft Exterior walls: ClapboardPorch area: 284 sqft Trim: NoneDeck area: 140 sqft Foundation type: Brick/FldstoneDetached garage area: 400 sqft
Features
Kitchen quality: Above Average
Recent residents
Resident Name | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
342 OTIS STREET REALTY TRUST | Status: Last owner (from Sep 18, 2015 to now) |
|
342 OTIS STREET REALTY TRUST /S TRS | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 28, 2003) |
|
342 OTIS STREET REALTY TRUST /S TR | Status: Previous owner (from Jan 23, 2001) |
|
Stanley R Shanfield, age 69 | (617) 969-5296 | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 02, 1989 to Sep 18, 2015) Occupation: Handlers, Equipment Cleaners, Helpers, and Laborers Occupations Education: High school graduate or higher Email: |
Melissa Shanfield, age 37 | (617) 969-5296 | |
Steven Shanfield, age 40 | (617) 969-5296 | |
Barbara P Thomas | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 02, 1989) |
|
John W Thomas | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 02, 1989) |
|
THOMAS-SLAYTER BARBARA P &AL | Status: Previous owner (to Oct 02, 1989) |
|
THOMAS JOHN WOODWARD | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 14, 1970) |
|
THOMAS BARBARA PINNEY | Status: Previous owner (from Aug 14, 1970) |
|
John C Marsh | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 03, 1968 to Aug 14, 1970) |
|
Jacqueline R Marsh | Status: Previous owner (from Sep 03, 1968 to Aug 14, 1970) |
|
Mary G Lancaster | Status: Previous owner (from May 26, 1952) |
|
Timothy F Demoy | Status: Previous owner (from May 26, 1952 to Sep 03, 1968) |
|
Esther E Demoy | Status: Previous owner (from May 26, 1952 to Sep 03, 1968) |
|
Ruby E B Dort | Status: Previous owner (to May 26, 1952) |
|
Katie Bates, age 39 | Education: High school graduate or higher |
|
Joseph N Dibiase | (617) 247-4854 |
Business records related to this address
Organization | Phone | More Info |
---|---|---|
Susan N Shanfield, age 71 | (617) 969-5296 | Status: Previous owner (from Oct 02, 1989 to Sep 18, 2015) Occupation: Clerical/White Collar Education: Associate degree or higher Type: Medical LICSW (Licensed Independent Clinical Social Worker) |
Broadband Access Inc | Industry: Nonclassifiable Establishments |
|
Steven Shanfield | (617) 969-9574 | SIC: 6021 - National Commercial Banks Site: |
Shanfield Steven | (617) 969-9574 | Email: Organization: Steven Shanfield Title: Chief Executive Site: Specialties: Other Nonscheduled Air Transportation; Advertising |
Neighbors
367 Otis St
G Raymond Ahrens
G Raymond Ahrens
Real estate transaction history
Date | Event | Price | Source | Agents |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/1989 | Sold | $475,000 | Public records |
Assessment history
Year | Tax | Assessment | Market |
---|---|---|---|
2016 | $1,209,400.00 | ||
2015 | $1,130,300.00 | ||
2014 | $1,076,700.00 | ||
2013 | $1,076,700.00 | ||
2012 | $1,076,700.00 | ||
2011 | $1,076,300.00 | ||
2010 | $1,098,300.00 | ||
2009 | $1,120,700.00 | ||
2008 | $1,120,700.00 | ||
2007 | $1,158,600.00 | ||
2006 | $1,124,900.00 | ||
2005 | $1,071,300.00 | ||
2004 | $973,400.00 | ||
2003 | $869,100.00 | ||
2002 | $869,100.00 | ||
2001 | $753,300.00 | ||
2000 | $687,900.00 | ||
1999 | $625,900.00 | ||
1998 | $512,000.00 | ||
1997 | $487,600.00 | ||
1996 | $464,400.00 | ||
1995 | $432,100.00 | ||
1994 | $423,700.00 | ||
1993 | $423,700.00 | ||
1992 | $446,900.00 |